Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Brian Michael Noble

Deceased

Bishop Emeritus of Shrewsbury, England, Great Britain


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
11 Apr 1936Born
11 Jun 196024.1Ordained PriestPriest of Lancaster, England, Great Britain
23 Jun 199559.1AppointedBishop of Shrewsbury, England, Great Britain
30 Aug 199559.3Ordained BishopBishop of Shrewsbury, England, Great Britain
1 Oct 201074.4RetiredBishop of Shrewsbury, England, Great Britain
21 Oct 201983.5DiedBishop Emeritus of Shrewsbury, England, Great Britain

MicroData Summary for Brian Michael Noble
Bishop Brian Michael Noble (born , died ) Bishop Emeritus of Shrewsbury

EventPlace
Birth PlaceLancaster, Lancashire, Diocese of Lancaster, England
Ordained PriestSt. Peter’s, Cathedral, Lancaster, Lancashire, Diocese of Lancaster, England
Ordained BishopSaint Anthony, Church, Wythenshawe, Cheshire, Diocese of Shrewsbury, England
Death PlaceArrowe Park, Hospital, Birkenhead, Cheshire, Diocese of Shrewsbury, England
Buried Place (Original)St. Winefride, Cemetery, Neston, Wirral, Cheshire, Diocese of Shrewsbury, England

  • a priest for 59.3 years
  • a bishop for 24.1 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • r: Bollettino, 1 Oct 2010
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 142, Number 12,581
  • loc: CL, 25 Jan 2018
  • d: CB, 23 Oct 2019
  • loc/c1: CL, 22 Oct 2019
  • d: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 242, Necrology (back)

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.2.7, 8 Feb 2020; Data: 24 Mar 2020

Quantcast