Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Włodzimierz Bronisław Jasiński

Deceased

Bishop Emeritus of Łódź, Poland

Titular Archbishop of Drizipara


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
12 Jun 1873Born
13 Oct 189522.3Ordained PriestPriest
21 Aug 193057.1AppointedBishop of Sandomierz, Poland
5 Oct 193057.3Ordained BishopBishop of Sandomierz, Poland
12 Oct 193057.3InstalledBishop of Sandomierz, Poland
30 Nov 193461.4AppointedBishop of Łódź, Poland
12 Dec 194673.5RetiredBishop of Łódź, Poland
12 Dec 194673.5AppointedTitular Archbishop of Drizipara
17 Apr 196591.8DiedBishop Emeritus of Łódź, Poland

MicroData Summary for Włodzimierz Bronisław Jasiński
Archbishop Włodzimierz Bronisław Jasiński (born , died ) Bishop Emeritus of Łódź

EventPlace
Birth PlaceWłocławek

  • a priest for 69.5 years
  • a bishop for 34.5 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2+: Revue des Ordinations Épiscopales, Issue 1,930, Number 66

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.2.7, 8 Feb 2020; Data: 24 Mar 2020

Quantcast