Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Andreas (André) Räß (Raess)

Deceased

Bishop of Strasbourg


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
6 Apr 1794BornSigolsheim
31 Aug 181622.4Ordained PriestPriest of Mainz, Germany
20 Aug 184046.3SelectedCoadjutor Bishop of Strasbourg, France
14 Dec 184046.6ConfirmedCoadjutor Bishop of Strasbourg, France
14 Dec 184046.6AppointedTitular Bishop of Rhodiapolis
14 Feb 184146.8Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Rhodiapolis
27 Aug 184248.3SucceededBishop of Strasbourg, France
17 Nov 188793.6DiedBishop of Strasbourg, France

MicroData Summary for Andreas (André) Räß (Raess):
Bishop Andreas (André) Räß (Raess) (born , died ) Bishop of Strasbourg

  • a priest for 71.2 years
  • a bishop for 46.7 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2+: LC
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 7, Page 88, and Page 323

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.6, 2 May 2015; Data: 4 May 2015