Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Paul-Georges-Marie Dupont des Loges

Deceased

Bishop of Metz, France


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
11 Nov 1804Born
20 Dec 182824.1Ordained PriestPriest of Rennes, France
26 Sep 184237.8SelectedBishop of Metz, France
27 Jan 184338.2ConfirmedBishop of Metz, France
5 Mar 184338.3Ordained BishopBishop of Metz, France
18 Aug 188681.7DiedBishop of Metz, France

MicroData Summary for Paul-Georges-Marie Dupont des Loges (VIAF: 56600830)
Bishop Paul-Georges-Marie Dupont des Loges (born , died ) Bishop of Metz

EventPlace
Birth PlaceRennes

  • a priest for 57.6 years
  • a bishop for 43.4 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2+: LC
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 7, Page 263
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1843, Number 10

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2017
Code: web_b, v3.1.6, 3 Jan 2017; Data: 6 Feb 2017