Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Jean-Nicaise Gros

Deceased

Bishop of Versailles


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
7 Oct 1794BornReims
16 May 181823.6Ordained PriestPriest
15 Oct 184248.0SelectedBishop of Saint-Dié, France
27 Jan 184348.3ConfirmedBishop of Saint-Dié, France
26 Feb 184348.4Ordained BishopBishop of Saint-Dié, France
23 Mar 184348.5InstalledBishop of Saint-Dié, France
5 Mar 184449.4SelectedBishop of Versailles, France
17 Jun 184449.7ConfirmedBishop of Versailles, France
30 Jul 184449.8InstalledBishop of Versailles, France
13 Dec 185763.2DiedBishop of Versailles, France

MicroData Summary for Jean-Nicaise Gros:
Bishop Jean-Nicaise Gros (born , died ) Bishop of Versailles

  • a priest for 39.6 years
  • a bishop for 14.8 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2+: LC
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi, Volume 7, Page 174, and Page 394

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013