Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Jean-Baptiste-Théodore Duval

Deceased

Bishop of Soissons (-Laon), France


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
6 Jun 1824Born
22 Dec 184925.5Ordained PriestPriest
28 Aug 188965.2SelectedBishop of Soissons (-Laon), France
30 Dec 188965.5ConfirmedBishop of Soissons (-Laon), France
24 Feb 189065.7Ordained BishopBishop of Soissons (-Laon), France
23 Aug 189773.2DiedBishop of Soissons (-Laon), France

MicroData Summary for Jean-Baptiste-Théodore Duval (VIAF: 22238530)
Bishop Jean-Baptiste-Théodore Duval (born , died ) Bishop of Soissons (-Laon)

EventPlace
Birth PlaceLe Havre
Ordained BishopCathedral, Rouen, Archdiocese of Rouen

  • a priest for 47.6 years
  • a bishop for 7.4 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2+: LC
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 8, Page 529
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1890, Number 13

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2017
Code: web_b, v3.1.6, 3 Jan 2017; Data: 24 May 2017