Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Francis Xavier Sudartanta Hadisumarta, O. Carm.

Bishop Emeritus of Manokwari-Sorong, Indonesia


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
13 Dec 1932 Born
12 Jul 195926.5Ordained PriestPriest of Order of Our Lady of Mt. Carmel
1 Mar 197340.2AppointedBishop of Malang, Indonesia
16 Jul 197340.5Ordained BishopBishop of Malang, Indonesia
5 May 198855.3AppointedBishop of Manokwari-Sorong, Indonesia
30 Jun 200370.5ResignedBishop of Manokwari-Sorong, Indonesia

MicroData Summary for Francis Xavier Sudartanta Hadisumarta (VIAF: 280323218)
Bishop Francis Xavier Sudartanta Hadisumarta O. Carm. (born ) Bishop Emeritus of Manokwari-Sorong

EventPlace
Birth PlaceAmbarawa
Ordained BishopMalang, Diocese of Malang

Please contact the Bishop through the Diocese of Manokwari-Sorong.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ob/c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 137
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 22, Number 1,224

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.2.7, 8 Feb 2020; Data: 24 Mar 2020

Quantcast