Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Michael Cornelis C. Coomans, M.S.F. †

Deceased

Bishop of Samarinda, Indonesia


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
5 Jun 1933Born
7 Sep 195421.2ProfessedMember of Congregation of Missionaries of the Holy Family
24 Jul 196027.1Ordained PriestPriest of Congregation of Missionaries of the Holy Family
30 Nov 198754.4AppointedBishop of Samarinda, Indonesia
14 Feb 198854.6Ordained BishopBishop of Samarinda, Indonesia
6 May 199258.9DiedBishop of Samarinda, Indonesia

MicroData Summary for Michael Cornelis C. Coomans
Bishop Michael Cornelis C. Coomans M.S.F. (born , died ) Bishop of Samarinda

EventPlace
Birth PlaceLoon op Zandt

  • a priest for 31.7 years
  • a bishop for 4.2 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 108, Number 9,527
  • obp: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 109, Additions/Corrections (front)
  • d: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 133

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast