Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Carlos Filipe Ximenes Belo, S.D.B.

Apostolic Administrator Emeritus of Díli

Titular Bishop of Lorium


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
3 Feb 1948 BornBaucau
21 Sep 197325.6ProfessedMember of Salesians of Saint John Bosco
26 Jul 198032.5Ordained PriestPriest of Salesians of Saint John Bosco
21 Mar 198840.1AppointedApostolic Administrator of Díli, Timor-Leste
21 Mar 198840.1AppointedTitular Bishop of Lorium
19 Jun 198840.4Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Lorium
26 Nov 200254.8ResignedApostolic Administrator of Díli, Timor-Leste

MicroData Summary for Carlos Filipe Ximenes Belo:
Bishop Carlos Filipe Ximenes Belo S.D.B. (born ) Apostolic Administrator Emeritus of Díli

Please contact the Bishop through the Diocese of Díli.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 114, Number 10,123
  • ob: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 146

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013