Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Justinus Cardinal Darmojuwono

Deceased

Archbishop Emeritus of Semarang

Cardinal-Priest of Santissimi Nome di Gesù e Maria in Via Lata


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
2 Nov 1914BornGodean
25 May 194732.6Ordained PriestPriest of Semarang, Indonesia
10 Dec 196349.1AppointedArchbishop of Semarang, Indonesia
6 Apr 196449.4Ordained BishopArchbishop of Semarang, Indonesia
8 Jul 196449.7AppointedBishop of Indonesia, Military
26 Jun 196752.6Elevated to Cardinal
26 Jun 196752.6AppointedCardinal-Priest of Santissimi Nome di Gesù e Maria in Via Lata
3 Jul 198166.7RetiredArchbishop of Semarang, Indonesia
31 Dec 198369.2RetiredBishop of Indonesia, Military
3 Feb 199479.3DiedArchbishop Emeritus of Semarang, Indonesia

MicroData Summary for Justinus Darmojuwono:
Cardinal Justinus Darmojuwono (born , died ) Archbishop Emeritus of Semarang

  • a priest for 46.7 years
  • a bishop for 29.8 years
  • a cardinal for 26.6 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ob/c2/d: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 137
  • d: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 141, Necrology (back)

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013