Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Anton Pain Ratu, S.V.D.

Bishop Emeritus of Atambua


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
2 Jan 1929 BornTanah Boleng
17 Aug 195829.6Ordained PriestPriest of Society of the Divine Word
2 Apr 198253.3AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Atambua, Indonesia
2 Apr 198253.3AppointedTitular Bishop of Zaba
21 Sep 198253.7Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Zaba
3 Feb 198455.1AppointedBishop of Atambua, Indonesia
2 Jun 200778.4RetiredBishop of Atambua, Indonesia

MicroData Summary for Anton Pain Ratu:
Bishop Anton Pain Ratu S.V.D. (born ) Bishop Emeritus of Atambua

Please contact the Bishop through the Diocese of Atambua.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • r: Bollettino, 2 Jun 2007

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013