Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Diocese of Surabaya

Dioecesis Surabayanus



Show: All | General Information | Historical Details | Ordinaries | Historical Summary | Statistics | Affiliated Bishops, Living | Affiliated Bishops, Deceased

Bishop(s)

General Information

  • Type of Jurisdiction: Diocese
  • Name Changed: 22 August 1973
  • Metropolitan: Archdiocese of Semarang
  • Rite: Latin (or Roman)
  • Country: Indonesia
  • Square Kilometers: 24,461 (9,448 Square Miles)
  • Mailing Address: Jl. Raya Dr. Sutomo 17, Surabaya 60265, Jawa, Indonesia
  • Telephone: (031)56.15.592; 56.77.796
  • Fax: 56.84.004

Historical Details


Past and Present Ordinaries



Historical Summary

DateEventFromTo
Prefecture Apostolic of Surabaia
15 February 1928ErectedVicariate Apostolic of Batavia Prefecture Apostolic of Surabaia (erected)
Vicariate Apostolic of Surabaia
16 October 1941ElevatedPrefecture Apostolic of Surabaia Vicariate Apostolic of Surabaia
Diocese of Surabaia
3 January 1961ElevatedVicariate Apostolic of Surabaia Diocese of Surabaia
Diocese of Surabaya
22 August 1973Name ChangedDiocese of Surabaia Diocese of Surabaya

Statistics

YearCatholicsTotal PopulationPercent CatholicDiocesan PriestsReligious PriestsTotal PriestsCatholics Per PriestPermanent DeaconsMale ReligiousFemale ReligiousParishesSource
Vicariate Apostolic of Surabaia
195021,8899,000,000.2%338415333513629ap1951
Diocese of Surabaia
197056,96613,000,000.4%55551,0358820166ap1971
Diocese of Surabaya
198090,58017,000,000.5%650561,617477213ap1981
1990143,88321,722,663.7%1553682,115413828027ap1991
1999184,80833,630,000.5%46551011,82946325135ap2000
2000185,28831,000,000.6%52541061,74847429135ap2001
2001190,2633,437,0005.5%53551081,76147529136ap2002
2002178,6893,400,0005.3%59571161,54049632837ap2003
2003119,7583,400,0003.5%635812198947934537ap2004
2004150,4573,400,0004.4%49531021,47548133937ap2005

Note: Any changes in boundaries over time are not indicated in the above table.


Affiliated Bishops, Living

Affiliated Bishops, Deceased

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2011
code: v2.7.5, 23 Nov 2011; data: 16 Dec 2011