Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Josephus Tethool, M.S.C. †

Deceased

Auxiliary Bishop Emeritus of Amboina, Indonesia

Titular Bishop of Apisa Maius


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1 Apr 1934Born
20 Dec 196127.7Ordained PriestPriest of Missionaries of the Sacred Heart of Jesus
2 Apr 198248.0AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Amboina, Indonesia
2 Apr 198248.0AppointedTitular Bishop of Apisa Maius
26 Sep 198248.4Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Apisa Maius
1 Apr 200975.0RetiredAuxiliary Bishop of Amboina, Indonesia
18 Jan 201075.7DiedAuxiliary Bishop Emeritus of Amboina, Indonesia

MicroData Summary for Josephus Tethool
Bishop Josephus Tethool M.S.C. (born , died ) Auxiliary Bishop Emeritus of Amboina

EventPlace
Birth PlaceBesuk

  • a priest for 48.0 years
  • a bishop for 27.3 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • r: Bollettino, 1 Apr 2009
  • d: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 204, Necrology (back)

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.8, 1 Jan 2018; Data: 2 Jan 2018