Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Fransiskus Xaverius Rocharjanta Prajasuta, M.S.F. †

Deceased

Bishop Emeritus of Banjarmasin, Indonesia


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
3 Nov 1931Born
19 Dec 195928.1Ordained PriestPriest of Congregation of Missionaries of the Holy Family
6 Jun 198351.5AppointedBishop of Banjarmasin, Indonesia
23 Oct 198351.9Ordained BishopBishop of Banjarmasin, Indonesia
14 Jun 200876.6RetiredBishop of Banjarmasin, Indonesia
28 Jul 201583.7DiedBishop Emeritus of Banjarmasin, Indonesia

MicroData Summary for Fransiskus Xaverius Rocharjanta Prajasuta
Bishop Fransiskus Xaverius Rocharjanta Prajasuta M.S.F. (born , died ) Bishop Emeritus of Banjarmasin

EventPlace
Birth PlaceNguntaranadi

  • a priest for 55.6 years
  • a bishop for 31.7 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • r: Bollettino, 14 Jun 2008
  • d: CB, 28 Jul 2015
  • d: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 225, Necrology (back)

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast