Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Ottavio De Liva

Deceased

Apostolic Internuncio to Indonesia

Titular Archbishop of Heliopolis in Phoenicia


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
10 Jun 1911Born
8 Jul 193423.0Ordained PriestPriest of Udine, Italy
18 Apr 196250.8AppointedTitular Archbishop of Heliopolis in Phoenicia
18 Apr 196250.8AppointedApostolic Internuncio to Indonesia
27 May 196250.9Ordained BishopTitular Archbishop of Heliopolis in Phoenicia
23 Aug 196554.2DiedApostolic Internuncio to Indonesia

MicroData Summary for Ottavio De Liva:
Archbishop Ottavio De Liva (born , died ) Apostolic Internuncio of Indonesia

  • a priest for 31.1 years
  • a bishop for 3.2 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2+: Revue des Ordinations Épiscopales, Issue 1962, Number 64
  • ob/c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 174, Deceased Cardinals (back)

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.2, 19 Jan 2015; Data: 30 Jan 2015