Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Lech Kaczmarek

Deceased

Bishop of Gdańsk, Poland


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
23 Sep 1909Born
28 Sep 193627.0Ordained PriestPriest
16 Nov 195849.1AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Gdańsk, Poland
16 Nov 195849.1AppointedTitular Bishop of Alia
18 Jan 195949.3Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Alia
1 Dec 197162.1AppointedBishop of Gdańsk, Poland
31 Jul 198474.8DiedBishop of Gdańsk, Poland

MicroData Summary for Lech Kaczmarek (VIAF: 3304858)
Bishop Lech Kaczmarek (born , died ) Bishop of Gdańsk

EventPlace
Birth PlacePoznan, Archdiocese of Gniezno e Poznań
Ordained BishopNotre Dame, Church, Gdańsk, Diocese of Gdańsk

  • a priest for 47.8 years
  • a bishop for 25.5 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/ob/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1959, Number 4
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 28, Number 1,590
  • ob/c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 67, Deceased Cardinals (back)

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.3.0, 24 Sep 2020; Data: 18 Nov 2020

Quantcast