Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Edmund Francis Gibbons

Deceased

Bishop Emeritus of Albany, New York, USA

Titular Bishop of Verbe


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
16 Sep 1868Born
27 May 189324.6Ordained PriestPriest of Buffalo, New York, USA
10 Mar 191950.4AppointedBishop of Albany, New York, USA
25 Mar 191950.5Ordained BishopBishop of Albany, New York, USA
10 Nov 195486.1RetiredBishop of Albany, New York, USA
10 Nov 195486.1AppointedTitular Bishop of Verbe
19 Jun 196495.7DiedBishop Emeritus of Albany, New York, USA

MicroData Summary for Edmund Francis Gibbons
Bishop Edmund Francis Gibbons (born , died ) Bishop Emeritus of Albany

EventPlace
Birth PlaceWhite Plains, NY

  • a priest for 71.0 years
  • a bishop for 45.2 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 9, Page 43
  • b/c2+: Revue des Ordinations Épiscopales, Issue 1,919, Number 14

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.2.7, 8 Feb 2020; Data: 24 Mar 2020

Quantcast