Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Edward Joseph Maginn

Deceased

Auxiliary Bishop Emeritus of Albany, New York, USA

Titular Bishop of Curium


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
4 Jan 1897Born
10 Jun 192225.4Ordained PriestPriest
27 Jun 195760.4AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Albany, New York, USA
27 Jun 195760.4AppointedTitular Bishop of Curium
12 Sep 195760.6Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Curium
8 Jul 197275.5RetiredAuxiliary Bishop of Albany, New York, USA
21 Aug 198487.6DiedAuxiliary Bishop Emeritus of Albany, New York, USA

MicroData Summary for Edward Joseph Maginn
Bishop Edward Joseph Maginn (born , died ) Auxiliary Bishop Emeritus of Albany

EventPlace
Birth PlaceGlasgow, Great Britain

  • a priest for 62.1 years
  • a bishop for 26.9 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast