Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Raymond Aloysius Lane, M.M. †

Deceased

Superior General Emeritus of Catholic Foreign Mission Society of America

Titular Bishop of Hypaepa


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
2 Jan 1894Born
191318.9ProfessedMember of Catholic Foreign Mission Society of America
8 Feb 192026.0Ordained PriestPriest of Catholic Foreign Mission Society of America
14 Apr 193238.2AppointedPrefect of Fushun [Fushun], China
13 Feb 194046.1AppointedTitular Bishop of Hypaepa
13 Feb 194046.1AppointedVicar Apostolic of Fushun [Fushun], China
11 Jun 194046.4Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Hypaepa
11 Apr 194652.2AppointedBishop of Fushun [Fushun], China
7 Aug 194652.5AppointedSuperior General of Catholic Foreign Mission Society of America
6 Aug 195662.5ResignedSuperior General of Catholic Foreign Mission Society of America
31 Jul 197480.5DiedSuperior General Emeritus of Catholic Foreign Mission Society of America

MicroData Summary for Raymond Aloysius Lane
Bishop Raymond Aloysius Lane M.M. (born , died ) Superior General Emeritus of Catholic Foreign Mission Society of America

EventPlace
Birth PlaceLawrence, MA, USA

  • a priest for 54.4 years
  • a bishop for 34.1 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2+: Revue des Ordinations Épiscopales, Issue 1940, Number 38

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.8, 1 Jan 2018; Data: 2 Jan 2018