Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop William Francis O’Hare, S.J. †

Deceased

Vicar Apostolic of Giamaica o Jamaica, Antilles

Titular Bishop of Maximianopolis in Arabia


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
23 Jan 1870Born
14 Aug 188818.5EnteredMember of Society of Jesus
25 Jun 190333.4Ordained PriestPriest of Society of Jesus
15 Aug 190636.5Final VowsPriest of Society of Jesus
2 Sep 191949.6AppointedVicar Apostolic of Giamaica o Jamaica, Antilles
2 Sep 191949.6AppointedTitular Bishop of Maximianopolis in Arabia
25 Feb 192050.0Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Maximianopolis in Arabia
11 Oct 192656.7DiedVicar Apostolic of Giamaica o Jamaica, Antilles

MicroData Summary for William Francis O’Hare
Bishop William Francis O’Hare S.J. (born , died ) Vicar Apostolic of Giamaica o Jamaica

EventPlace
Birth PlaceSouth Boston, MA, Archdiocese of Boston, Massachusetts, USA
Ordained PriestWoodstock College, Woodstock, MD
Ordained BishopSaint Ignatius, Church, New York, Archdiocese of New York, New York, USA
Death PlaceAt Sea, Near Harbour Head, Vicariate Apostolic of Giamaica o Jamaica

  • a priest for 23.2 years
  • a bishop for 6.6 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ob/d: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 133
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1920, Number 8

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2022
Code: web_b, v3.3.3, 16 Jun 2022; Data: 9 Oct 2022