Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Thomas Albert Newman, M.S. †

Deceased

Bishop Emeritus of Prome, Myanmar


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
3 Nov 1903Born
29 Jun 192925.6Ordained PriestPriest of Missionaries of Our Lady of La Salette
12 Jul 194036.6AppointedPrefect of Akyab, Myanmar
21 Feb 196157.2AppointedBishop of Prome, Myanmar
21 May 196157.5Ordained BishopBishop of Prome, Myanmar
2 Oct 197571.9ResignedBishop of Prome, Myanmar
9 Mar 197874.3DiedBishop Emeritus of Prome, Myanmar

MicroData Summary for Thomas Albert Newman
Bishop Thomas Albert Newman M.S. (born , died ) Bishop Emeritus of Prome

EventPlace
Birth PlaceWaterbury, CT, USA

  • a priest for 48.6 years
  • a bishop for 16.8 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • c2+: CB

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast