Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop William Aloysius Scully

Deceased

Bishop of Albany, New York, USA


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
6 Aug 1894Born
20 Sep 191925.1Ordained PriestPriest of New York, New York, USA
21 Aug 194551.0AppointedCoadjutor Bishop of Albany, New York, USA
21 Aug 194551.0AppointedTitular Bishop of Pharsalus
24 Oct 194551.2Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Pharsalus
10 Nov 195460.2SucceededBishop of Albany, New York, USA
5 Jan 196974.4DiedBishop of Albany, New York, USA

MicroData Summary for William Aloysius Scully
Bishop William Aloysius Scully (born , died ) Bishop of Albany

EventPlace
Birth PlaceNew York

  • a priest for 49.2 years
  • a bishop for 23.1 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2+: Revue des Ordinations ╔piscopales, Issue 1945, Number 57

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.8, 1 Jan 2018; Data: 2 Jan 2018