Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Daniel-Auguste Lemonnier

Deceased

Auxiliary Bishop of Rouen

Titular Bishop of Byblus


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
30 May 1902BornAnneville-sur-Seine
11 Jul 192523.1Ordained PriestPriest
9 Aug 194745.2AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Rouen, France
9 Aug 194745.2AppointedTitular Bishop of Byblus
28 Oct 194745.4Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Byblus
29 Dec 195957.6DiedAuxiliary Bishop of Rouen, France

MicroData Summary for Daniel-Auguste Lemonnier:
Bishop Daniel-Auguste Lemonnier (born , died ) Auxiliary Bishop of Rouen

  • a priest for 34.5 years
  • a bishop for 12.2 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • c2+: LC
  • b/c2+: Revue des Ordinations Épiscopales, Issue 1947, Number 117

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013