Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Wilhelm Cleven

Deceased

Auxiliary Bishop Emeritus of Köln {Cologne}, Germany

Titular Bishop of Sasima


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
25 Jul 1893Born
14 Aug 192128.0Ordained PriestPriest of Köln {Cologne}, Germany
18 Nov 195057.3AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Köln {Cologne}, Germany
18 Nov 195057.3AppointedTitular Bishop of Sasima
28 Jan 195157.5Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Sasima
25 Jul 198390.0RetiredAuxiliary Bishop of Köln {Cologne}, Germany
14 Aug 198390.0DiedAuxiliary Bishop Emeritus of Köln {Cologne}, Germany

MicroData Summary for Wilhelm Cleven
Bishop Wilhelm Cleven (born , died ) Auxiliary Bishop Emeritus of Köln {Cologne}

EventPlace
Birth PlaceSaeffelen

  • a priest for 62.0 years
  • a bishop for 32.5 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: CB, 22 Jul 2012
  • b/c2+: Revue des Ordinations Épiscopales, Issue 1951, Number 3

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.8, 1 Jan 2018; Data: 2 Jan 2018