Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Augustinus Frotz

Deceased

Auxiliary Bishop Emeritus of Köln {Cologne}

Titular Bishop of Corada


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
25 May 1903BornWuppertal-Vohwinkel
26 Oct 193027.4Ordained PriestPriest of Köln {Cologne}, Germany
7 Aug 196259.2AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Köln {Cologne}, Germany
7 Aug 196259.2AppointedTitular Bishop of Corada
7 Oct 196259.4Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Corada
30 May 198380.0RetiredAuxiliary Bishop of Köln {Cologne}, Germany
12 Nov 199491.5DiedAuxiliary Bishop Emeritus of Köln {Cologne}, Germany

MicroData Summary for Augustinus Frotz:
Bishop Augustinus Frotz (born , died ) Auxiliary Bishop Emeritus of Köln {Cologne}

  • a priest for 64.0 years
  • a bishop for 32.1 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • d: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 141, Necrology (back)
  • b/c2+: Revue des Ordinations Épiscopales, Issue 1962, Number 171

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2014
code: v2.9.7, 12 Jan 2014; data: 6 Feb 2014