Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Bernard Schilling, S.V.D. †

Deceased

Vicar Apostolic Emeritus of Goroka

Titular Bishop of Callipolis


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
2 Oct 1914BornSomborn, Germany
14 Sep 194732.9Ordained PriestPriest of Society of the Divine Word
19 Dec 195945.2AppointedVicar Apostolic of Goroka, Papua New Guinea
19 Dec 195945.2AppointedTitular Bishop of Callipolis
22 Jan 196045.3AppointedApostolic Administrator of Lae, Papua New Guinea
19 Mar 196045.5Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Callipolis
15 Nov 196652.1ResignedVicar Apostolic of Goroka, Papua New Guinea
15 Nov 196652.1ResignedApostolic Administrator of Lae, Papua New Guinea
16 Jun 199277.7DiedVicar Apostolic Emeritus of Goroka, Papua New Guinea

MicroData Summary for Bernard Schilling:
Bishop Bernard Schilling S.V.D. (born , died ) Vicar Apostolic Emeritus of Goroka

  • a priest for 44.8 years
  • a bishop for 32.2 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • c2+: CB
  • d: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 133
  • b/c2+: Revue des Ordinations ╔piscopales, Issue 1960, Number 18

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013