Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Anton Hubert Cardinal Fischer

Deceased

Archbishop of Köln {Cologne}, Germany

Cardinal-Priest of Santi Nereo ed Achilleo


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
30 May 1840Born
2 Sep 186323.2Ordained PriestPriest of Köln {Cologne}, Germany
14 Feb 188948.7AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Köln {Cologne}, Germany
14 Feb 188948.7AppointedTitular Bishop of Iuliopolis
1 May 188948.9Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Iuliopolis
6 Nov 190262.4SelectedArchbishop of Köln {Cologne}, Germany
14 Feb 190362.7ConfirmedArchbishop of Köln {Cologne}, Germany
19 Mar 190362.8InstalledArchbishop of Köln {Cologne}, Germany
22 Jun 190363.0Elevated to Cardinal
25 Jun 190363.0AppointedCardinal-Priest of Santi Nereo ed Achilleo
30 Jul 191272.1DiedArchbishop of Köln {Cologne}, Germany

MicroData Summary for Anton Hubert Fischer (VIAF: 57408858)
Anton Hubert Cardinal Fischer (born , died ) Archbishop of Köln {Cologne}

EventPlace
Birth PlaceJülich, Archdiocese of Köln {Cologne}
Ordained PriestKöln, Archdiocese of Köln {Cologne}
Ordained BishopCathedral, Köln, Archdiocese of Köln {Cologne}
Death PlaceBad Neuenahr
Buried Place (Original)Cathedral, Köln, Archdiocese of Köln {Cologne}

  • a priest for 48.9 years
  • a bishop for 23.2 years
  • a cardinal for 9.1 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 8, Page 215, and Page 327
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 8, Page 51
  • b: The Cardinals of the Holy Roman Church, 22 Jun 1903
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1889, Number 23

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2017
Code: web_b, v3.1.6, 3 Jan 2017; Data: 24 May 2017