Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Ferdinand Dirichs

Deceased

Bishop of Limburg


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
24 Nov 1894BornFrankfurt am Main
23 Dec 192228.0Ordained PriestPriest of Limburg, Germany
24 Sep 194752.8AppointedBishop of Limburg, Germany
21 Nov 194752.9Ordained BishopBishop of Limburg, Germany
27 Dec 194854.0DiedBishop of Limburg, Germany

MicroData Summary for Ferdinand Dirichs:
Bishop Ferdinand Dirichs (born , died ) Bishop of Limburg

  • a priest for 26.0 years
  • a bishop for 1.0 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2+: Revue des Ordinations ╔piscopales, Issue 1947, Number 123

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.2, 19 Jan 2015; Data: 30 Jan 2015