Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Wendelin Rauch

Deceased

Archbishop of Freiburg im Breisgau


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
30 Aug 1885BornZell a. Andelsbach
28 Oct 191025.1Ordained PriestPriest of Freiburg im Breisgau, Germany
27 Jul 194862.9SelectedArchbishop of Freiburg im Breisgau, Germany
27 Aug 194862.9ConfirmedArchbishop of Freiburg im Breisgau, Germany
28 Oct 194863.1Ordained BishopArchbishop of Freiburg im Breisgau, Germany
28 Apr 195468.6DiedArchbishop of Freiburg im Breisgau, Germany

MicroData Summary for Wendelin Rauch:
Archbishop Wendelin Rauch (born , died ) Archbishop of Freiburg im Breisgau

  • a priest for 43.5 years
  • a bishop for 5.5 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2+: Revue des Ordinations ╔piscopales, Issue 1948, Number 116

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.2, 19 Jan 2015; Data: 30 Jan 2015