Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Wilhelm Stockums

Deceased

Auxiliary Bishop of Köln {Cologne}, Germany

Titular Bishop of Erythrae


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
15 Oct 1877Born
15 Mar 190224.4Ordained PriestPriest of Köln {Cologne}, Germany
5 Feb 193254.3AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Köln {Cologne}, Germany
5 Feb 193254.3AppointedTitular Bishop of Erythrae
20 Apr 193254.5Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Erythrae
5 Aug 195678.8DiedAuxiliary Bishop of Köln {Cologne}, Germany

MicroData Summary for Wilhelm Stockums
Bishop Wilhelm Stockums (born , died ) Auxiliary Bishop of Köln {Cologne}

EventPlace
Birth PlaceElmpt

  • a priest for 54.3 years
  • a bishop for 24.2 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2+: Revue des Ordinations Épiscopales, Issue 1932, Number 20

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.8, 1 Jan 2018; Data: 2 Jan 2018