Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Josef Plöger

Deceased

Auxiliary Bishop Emeritus of Köln {Cologne}, Germany

Titular Bishop of Aguntum


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
6 Jul 1923Born
24 Feb 195329.6Ordained PriestPriest
9 May 197551.8AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Köln {Cologne}, Germany
9 May 197551.8AppointedTitular Bishop of Aguntum
19 May 197551.8Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Aguntum
15 Apr 199167.7ResignedAuxiliary Bishop of Köln {Cologne}, Germany
22 Apr 200581.7DiedAuxiliary Bishop Emeritus of Köln {Cologne}, Germany

MicroData Summary for Josef Plöger (VIAF: 8119089)
Bishop Josef Plöger (born , died ) Auxiliary Bishop Emeritus of Köln {Cologne}

EventPlace
Birth PlaceHünningen

  • a priest for 52.1 years
  • a bishop for 29.9 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ob/c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 105, Deceased Cardinals (back)
  • d: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 183, Necrology (back)

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 11 Aug 2018

Quantcast