Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Hubert Luthe

Deceased

Bishop Emeritus of Essen, Germany


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
22 May 1927Born
2 Jul 195326.1Ordained PriestPriest of Köln {Cologne}, Germany
28 Oct 196942.4AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Köln {Cologne}, Germany
28 Oct 196942.4AppointedTitular Bishop of Egabro
14 Dec 196942.5Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Egabro
18 Dec 199164.5AppointedBishop of Essen, Germany
2 Feb 199264.6InstalledBishop of Essen, Germany
22 May 200275.0RetiredBishop of Essen, Germany
4 Feb 201486.7DiedBishop Emeritus of Essen, Germany

MicroData Summary for Hubert Luthe
Bishop Hubert Luthe (born , died ) Bishop Emeritus of Essen

EventPlace
Birth PlaceLindlar

  • a priest for 60.5 years
  • a bishop for 44.1 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ob/c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 105, Deceased Cardinals (back)
  • d: CB, 4 Feb 2014
  • d: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 221, Necrology (back)

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast