Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Valeriu Traian Frentiu

Deceased

Bishop of Oradea Mare {Gran Varadino} (Romanian), Romania


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
25 Apr 1875Born
28 Sep 189823.4Ordained PriestPriest
14 Dec 191237.6AppointedBishop of Lugoj (Romanian), Romania
14 Jan 191337.7Ordained BishopBishop of Lugoj (Romanian), Romania
25 Feb 192246.8AppointedBishop of Oradea Mare {Gran Varadino} (Romanian), Romania
1941²65.6AppointedApostolic Administrator of Făgăraş şi Alba Iulia (Romanian), Romania
1947²71.6CeasedApostolic Administrator of Făgăraş şi Alba Iulia (Romanian), Romania
11 Jul 195277.2DiedBishop of Oradea Mare {Gran Varadino} (Romanian), Romania

Note(s): ² Month Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Valeriu Traian Frentiu
Bishop Valeriu Traian Frentiu (born , died ) Bishop of Oradea Mare {Gran Varadino}

EventPlace
Birth PlaceResita
Death PlacePrison, Maramures

  • a priest for 53.7 years
  • a bishop for 39.4 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ob/d: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 105, Additions/Corrections (back)
  • ob/d: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 121
  • op/ob: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 155, Additions/Corrections (front)
  • b/c2+: Revue des Ordinations Épiscopales, Issue 1913, Number 3

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast