Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Bl. Ioan Suciu

Deceased

Apostolic Administrator of Făgăraş şi Alba Iulia (Romanian), Romania

Titular Bishop of Moglaena


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
4 Dec 1907Born
29 Nov 193123.9Ordained PriestPriest
25 May 194032.4AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Oradea Mare {Gran Varadino} (Romanian), Romania
25 May 194032.4AppointedTitular Bishop of Moglaena
22 Jul 194032.6Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Moglaena
1942¹34.0AppointedApostolic Administrator of Făgăraş şi Alba Iulia (Romanian), Romania
27 Jun 195345.5DiedApostolic Administrator of Făgăraş şi Alba Iulia (Romanian), Romania
2 Jun 2019Beatified

Note(s): ¹ Year Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Bl. Ioan Suciu
Bishop Bl. Ioan Suciu (born , died ) Apostolic Administrator of Făgăraş şi Alba Iulia

EventPlace
Birth PlaceBlaj

  • a priest for 21.5 years
  • a bishop for 12.9 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ob/d: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 121
  • bd/op/ob: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 155, Additions/Corrections (front)
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1940, Number 42

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.3.0, 24 Sep 2020; Data: 18 Nov 2020

Quantcast