Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Ioan Ploscaru

Deceased

Bishop Emeritus of Lugoj (Romanian)


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
19 Nov 1911BornFrata
17 Sep 193321.8Ordained PriestPriest
21 Nov 194837.0AppointedTitular Bishop of Trapezopolis
30 Nov 194837.0Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Trapezopolis
14 Mar 199078.3AppointedBishop of Lugoj (Romanian), Romania
20 Nov 199584.0RetiredBishop of Lugoj (Romanian), Romania
29 Nov 199685.0AppointedArchbishop (Personal Title)
31 Jul 199886.7DiedBishop Emeritus of Lugoj (Romanian), Romania

MicroData Summary for Ioan Ploscaru:
Archbishop Ioan Ploscaru (born , died ) Bishop Emeritus of Lugoj

  • a priest for 64.9 years
  • a bishop for 49.7 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • c2+: CB
  • b/ob/c23: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 121, Number 10,854
  • d: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 154, Necrology (back)
  • b/c2+: Revue des Ordinations Épiscopales, Issue 1948, Number 132

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013