Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Iosif Papp-Szilágyi

Deceased

Bishop of Oradea Mare {Gran Varadino} (Romanian)


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
10 Apr 1813BornEr-Teresa
6 Aug 183623.3Ordained DeaconDeacon
15 Aug 183623.3Ordained PriestPriest
4 Dec 186249.7SelectedBishop of Oradea Mare {Gran Varadino} (Romanian), Romania
16 Mar 186349.9ConfirmedBishop of Oradea Mare {Gran Varadino} (Romanian), Romania
3 May 186350.1Ordained BishopBishop of Oradea Mare {Gran Varadino} (Romanian), Romania
5 Aug 187360.3DiedBishop of Oradea Mare {Gran Varadino} (Romanian), Romania

MicroData Summary for Iosif Papp-Szilágyi:
Bishop Iosif Papp-Szilágyi (born , died ) Bishop of Oradea Mare {Gran Varadino}

  • a priest for 37.0 years
  • a bishop for 10.3 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Annuario Pontificio, Year 1872
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi, Volume 8, Page 359

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013