Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Ioan Chertes

Deceased

Titular Archbishop of Cantanus


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
10 Sep 1911BornSaratel, Bistrita-Nasaud, Romania
21 Dec 193524.3Ordained PriestPriest of Cluj-Gherla (Romanian), Romania
21 Nov 194938.2AppointedTitular Bishop of Cantanus
25 Dec 1949³38.3Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Cantanus
14 Mar 199078.5AppointedTitular Archbishop of Cantanus
31 Jan 199280.4DiedTitular Archbishop of Cantanus

Note(s): ³ Day Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Ioan Chertes:
Archbishop Ioan Chertes (born , died ) Titular Archbishop of Cantanus

  • a priest for 56.1 years
  • a bishop for 42.1 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 120, Number 10,770
  • ob: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 121
  • d: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 133
  • ob/d: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 155, Additions/Corrections (front)
  • b/c2+: Revue des Ordinations Épiscopales, Issue 1949, Number 112

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013