Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Mihai Robu

Deceased

Bishop of Iaşi


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
10 Apr 1884BornSabaoani
20 Apr 190723.0Ordained PriestPriest
7 May 192541.1AppointedBishop of Iaşi, Romania
20 Sep 192541.4Ordained BishopBishop of Iaşi, Romania
27 Sep 194460.5DiedBishop of Iaşi, Romania

MicroData Summary for Mihai Robu:
Bishop Mihai Robu (born , died ) Bishop of Iaşi

  • a priest for 37.4 years
  • a bishop for 19.0 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • op: Annuaire Pontifical Catholique, Year 1939
  • b/c2+: Revue des Ordinations Épiscopales, Issue 1925, Number 51

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013