Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Iuliu Hirtea

Deceased

Auxiliary Bishop of Oradea Mare {Gran Varadino} (Romanian), Romania

Titular Bishop of Nebbi


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
13 Apr 1914Born
17 May 193622.0Ordained DeaconDeacon of Oradea Mare {Gran Varadino} (Romanian), Romania
25 Mar 193722.9Ordained PriestPriest of Oradea Mare {Gran Varadino} (Romanian), Romania
1949²34.7AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Oradea Mare {Gran Varadino} (Romanian), Romania
1949²34.7AppointedTitular Bishop of Nebbi
28 Jul 194935.2Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Nebbi
28 Jun 197864.2DiedAuxiliary Bishop of Oradea Mare {Gran Varadino} (Romanian), Romania

Note(s): ² Month Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Iuliu Hirtea
Bishop Iuliu Hirtea (born , died ) Auxiliary Bishop of Oradea Mare {Gran Varadino}

EventPlace
Birth PlaceVintirea

  • a priest for 41.2 years
  • a bishop for 28.9 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ob/d: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 121
  • b/c2+: Revue des Ordinations Épiscopales, Issue 1949, Number 63

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast