Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Victor Mihaly de Apşa

Deceased

Archbishop of Făgăraş şi Alba Iulia (Romanian), Romania


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
19 May 1841Born
26 May 186322.0Ordained DeaconDeacon
8 Nov 186322.4Ordained PriestPriest
25 Nov 187433.5SelectedBishop of Lugoj (Romanian), Romania
21 Dec 187433.5ConfirmedBishop of Lugoj (Romanian), Romania
14 Feb 187533.7Ordained BishopBishop of Lugoj (Romanian), Romania
7 Mar 187533.8InstalledBishop of Lugoj (Romanian), Romania
15 Nov 189453.4SelectedArchbishop of Făgăraş şi Alba Iulia (Romanian), Romania
18 Mar 189553.8ConfirmedArchbishop of Făgăraş şi Alba Iulia (Romanian), Romania
26 May 189554.0InstalledArchbishop of Făgăraş şi Alba Iulia (Romanian), Romania
21 Jan 191876.6DiedArchbishop of Făgăraş şi Alba Iulia (Romanian), Romania

MicroData Summary for Victor Mihaly de Apşa (VIAF: 8615447)
Archbishop Victor Mihaly de Apşa (born , died ) Archbishop of Făgăraş şi Alba Iulia

EventPlace
Birth PlaceJoód
Ordained BishopBlaj

  • a priest for 54.2 years
  • a bishop for 42.9 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Annuario Pontificio, Year 1913
  • d: Annuario Pontificio, Year 1919
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 8, Page 274, and Page 354
  • c34: ATh, 22 Nov 2015
  • b/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 225, Number 18,655
  • b/c2: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1875, Number 14

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2017
Code: web_b, v3.1.6, 3 Jan 2017; Data: 12 Jun 2017