Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Augustine Ndubueze Echema

Bishop of Aba, Nigeria


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
28 Dec 1958 Born
16 Aug 198627.6Ordained PriestPriest of Owerri, Nigeria
28 Dec 201961.0AppointedBishop of Aba, Nigeria
13 Feb 202061.1Ordained BishopBishop of Aba, Nigeria

MicroData Summary for Augustine Ndubueze Echema
Bishop Augustine Ndubueze Echema (born ) Bishop of Aba

EventPlace
Birth PlaceOhuhu Nsulu, Diocese of Umuahia
Ordained BishopChrist the King, Cathedral, Aba, Diocese of Aba

Please contact the Bishop through the Diocese of Aba.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Bollettino, 28 Dec 2019
  • ob: CB, 6 Jan 2020
  • ob/c2+: CB, 8 Feb 2020

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.2.7, 8 Feb 2020; Data: 24 Mar 2020

Quantcast