Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Giacomo Barabino

Deceased

Bishop Emeritus of Ventimiglia-San Remo, Italy


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
4 Apr 1928Born
29 Jun 195224.2Ordained PriestPriest of Genova, Italy
16 May 197446.1AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Bobbio (-Abbey of San Colombano), Italy
16 May 197446.1AppointedTitular Bishop of Rebellum
24 Jun 197446.2Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Rebellum
30 Sep 198658.4AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Genova-Bobbio, Italy
7 Dec 198860.6AppointedBishop of Ventimiglia-San Remo, Italy
5 Mar 198960.9InstalledBishop of Ventimiglia-San Remo, Italy
20 Mar 200475.9RetiredBishop of Ventimiglia-San Remo, Italy
25 May 201688.1DiedBishop Emeritus of Ventimiglia-San Remo, Italy

MicroData Summary for Giacomo Barabino
Bishop Giacomo Barabino (born , died ) Bishop Emeritus of Ventimiglia-San Remo

EventPlace
Birth PlaceLivellato di Ceranesi, Archdiocese of Genova
Ordained PriestSan Lorenzo, Cathedral, Genova, Archdiocese of Genova
Ordained BishopSan Lorenzo, Cathedral, Genova, Archdiocese of Genova
Death PlaceVallecrosia, Diocese of Ventimiglia-San Remo
Buried Place (Original)Crypt, Cathedral, Ventimiglia, Diocese of Ventimiglia-San Remo

  • a priest for 63.9 years
  • a bishop for 41.9 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ob/c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 115
  • d: CB, 25 May 2016
  • d: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 230, Necrology (back)
  • i/loc: AM, 1 Aug 2018

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 4 Aug 2018

Quantcast