Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Ernest Anaezichukwu Obodo

Auxiliary Bishop of Enugu, Nigeria

Titular Bishop of Mediana


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
24 Oct 1966 Born
22 Jul 200033.7Ordained PriestPriest of Enugu, Nigeria
25 May 201851.5AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Enugu, Nigeria
25 May 201851.5AppointedTitular Bishop of Mediana
31 Aug 201851.8Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Mediana

MicroData Summary for Ernest Anaezichukwu Obodo
Bishop Ernest Anaezichukwu Obodo (born ) Auxiliary Bishop of Enugu

EventPlace
Birth PlaceAwha-Imezi, Diocese of Enugu
Ordained BishopSt. Paul, Church, Ozalla, Diocese of Enugu

Please contact the Bishop through the Diocese of Enugu.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Bollettino, 25 May 2018
  • ob: CB, 10 Jun 2018
  • ob: CB, 21 Aug 2018

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.2.0, 30 Aug 2018; Data: 1 Sep 2018

Quantcast