Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Patrick S. Eluke

Auxiliary Bishop of Port Harcourt, Nigeria

Titular Bishop of Photice


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
25 Mar 1967 Born
23 Sep 199528.4Ordained PriestPriest of Port Harcourt, Nigeria
12 Feb 201951.8AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Port Harcourt, Nigeria
12 Feb 201951.8AppointedTitular Bishop of Photice
9 May 201952.1Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Photice

MicroData Summary for Patrick S. Eluke
Bishop Patrick S. Eluke (born ) Auxiliary Bishop of Port Harcourt

EventPlace
Birth PlaceEkpeye, Ahoada, Diocese of Port Harcourt
Ordained BishopCorpus Christi, Cathedral, Port Harcourt, Diocese of Port Harcourt

Please contact the Bishop through the Diocese of Port Harcourt.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Bollettino, 12 Feb 2019
  • ob: CB, 12 Mar 2019
  • c2+: CB, 7 May 2019
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 240, Number 20,148

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2019
Code: web_b, v3.2.4, 3 Mar 2019; Data: 19 Sep 2019

Quantcast