Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archdiocese of Nanchang [Nanchang]

Archidioecesis Nanciamensis



Show: All | General Information | Historical Details | Ordinaries | Historical Summary | Statistics | Affiliated Bishops, Living | Affiliated Bishops, Deceased

Bishop(s)


Suffragan Dioceses

General Information

  • Type of Jurisdiction: Archdiocese
  • Elevated: 11 April 1946
  • Metropolitan See
  • Rite: Latin (or Roman)
  • Country: China
  • Mailing Address: Catholic Mission, Archbishop's House, Nanchang, Jiangxi, China

Historical Details


Past and Present Ordinaries



Historical Summary

DateEventFromTo
Vicariate Apostolic of Kiam-Si {Kiangsi}
14 August 1838ErectedVicariate Apostolic of Kiam-Si {Kiangsi} (erected)
19 August 1879Territory LostVicariate Apostolic of Kiam-Si {Kiangsi} Vicariate Apostolic of Southern Kiangsi {Kiam-Si Meridionale} (erected)
Vicariate Apostolic of Northern Kiangsi {Kiam-Si Settentrionale}
19 August 1879Name ChangedVicariate Apostolic of Kiam-Si {Kiangsi} Vicariate Apostolic of Northern Kiangsi {Kiam-Si Settentrionale}
28 August 1885Territory LostVicariate Apostolic of Northern Kiangsi {Kiam-Si Settentrionale} Vicariate Apostolic of Eastern Kiangsi {Kiam-Si Orientale} (erected)
Vicariate Apostolic of Kiou-Kiang
25 August 1920Name ChangedVicariate Apostolic of Northern Kiangsi {Kiam-Si Settentrionale} Vicariate Apostolic of Kiou-Kiang
Vicariate Apostolic of Nanchang [Nanchang]
3 December 1924Name ChangedVicariate Apostolic of Kiou-Kiang Vicariate Apostolic of Nanchang [Nanchang]
Archdiocese of Nanchang [Nanchang]
11 April 1946ElevatedVicariate Apostolic of Nanchang [Nanchang] Archdiocese of Nanchang [Nanchang]

Statistics

YearCatholicsTotal PopulationPercent CatholicDiocesan PriestsReligious PriestsTotal PriestsCatholics Per PriestPermanent DeaconsMale ReligiousFemale ReligiousParishesSource
Archdiocese of Nanchang [Nanchang]
195025,9964,872,691.5%1323367224718ap1951

Note: Any changes in boundaries over time are not indicated in the above table.


Affiliated Bishops, Living

Affiliated Bishops, Deceased

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.0, 19 Jun 2013; data: 5 Jul 2013