Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Fabiano Francesco Landi, O.F.M. †

Deceased

Vicar Apostolic of Northwestern Hupeh {Hu-Pè Occiduo-Settentrionale}, China

Titular Bishop of Taenarum


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
10 Mar 1872Born
188714.8ProfessedMember of Order of Friars Minor
16 Sep 189422.5Ordained PriestPriest of Order of Friars Minor
16 May 190432.1AppointedVicar Apostolic of Northwestern Hupeh {Hu-Pè Occiduo-Settentrionale}, China
16 May 190432.1AppointedTitular Bishop of Taenarum
2 Oct 190432.5Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Taenarum
30 Jun 192048.3DiedVicar Apostolic of Northwestern Hupeh {Hu-Pè Occiduo-Settentrionale}, China

MicroData Summary for Fabiano Francesco Landi
Bishop Fabiano Francesco Landi O.F.M. (born , died ) Vicar Apostolic of Northwestern Hupeh {Hu-Pè Occiduo-Settentrionale}

EventPlace
Birth PlaceRadda, Diocese of Fiesole, Italy
Ordained BishopHankow
Death PlaceLaohokow

  • a priest for 25.7 years
  • a bishop for 15.7 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Annuario Pontificio, Year 1,913
  • d: Annuario Pontificio, Year 1,921
  • ob: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 132
  • b/c2+: Revue des Ordinations Épiscopales, Issue 1,904, Number 49
  • b: Bishops-In-China.com, 17 Jan 2020

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.2.7, 8 Feb 2020; Data: 24 Mar 2020

Quantcast