Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Alexandre Evreinoff

Deceased

Titular Archbishop of Parium


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
8 Mar 1877Born
1905²27.8Converted
7 Dec 191336.7Ordained PriestPriest
31 Oct 193659.6AppointedTitular Bishop of Pionia
6 Dec 193659.7Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Pionia
19 Mar 194770.0AppointedTitular Archbishop of Parium
20 Aug 195982.4DiedTitular Archbishop of Parium

Note(s): ² Month Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Alexandre Evreinoff
Archbishop Alexandre Evreinoff (born , died ) Titular Archbishop of Parium

EventPlace
Birth PlacePetrograd

  • a priest for 45.7 years
  • a bishop for 22.7 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2+: Revue des Ordinations Épiscopales, Issue 1936, Number 86
  • conv: CB, 2 Jan 2018

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast