Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop John Adel Elya, B.S. †

Deceased

Bishop Emeritus of Newton (Our Lady of the Annunciation in Boston) (Melkite Greek), USA


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
16 Sep 1928Born
1949²20.2Solemn VowsMember of Arrouhbaniat Albassiliat Almoukhalissiat (Melkite Greek)
17 Feb 195223.4Ordained PriestPriest of Arrouhbaniat Albassiliat Almoukhalissiat (Melkite Greek)
21 Mar 198657.5AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Newton (Our Lady of the Annunciation in Boston) (Melkite Greek), USA
21 Mar 198657.5AppointedTitular Bishop of Abila Lysaniae
29 Jun 198657.7Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Abila Lysaniae
25 Nov 199365.1AppointedBishop of Newton (Our Lady of the Annunciation in Boston) (Melkite Greek), USA
25 Jan 199465.3InstalledBishop of Newton (Our Lady of the Annunciation in Boston) (Melkite Greek), USA
22 Jun 200475.7RetiredBishop of Newton (Our Lady of the Annunciation in Boston) (Melkite Greek), USA
19 Jul 201990.8DiedBishop Emeritus of Newton (Our Lady of the Annunciation in Boston) (Melkite Greek), USA

Note(s): ² Month Uncertain

MicroData Summary for John Adel Elya
Bishop John Adel Elya B.S. (born , died ) Bishop Emeritus of Newton (Our Lady of the Annunciation in Boston)

EventPlace
Birth PlaceMaghdouché, Lebanon
Death PlaceDeir El Moukhalles, Monastery, Joun, Lebanon

  • a priest for 67.4 years
  • a bishop for 33.0 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • sole/i: CB, 19 Jul 2017
  • d: CB, 19 Jul 2019

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2019
Code: web_b, v3.2.4, 3 Mar 2019; Data: 19 Sep 2019

Quantcast