Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Stephen John Kocisko

Deceased

Archbishop Emeritus of Pittsburgh (Ruthenian), Pennsylvania


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
11 Jun 1915BornMinneapolis, MN
30 Mar 194125.8Ordained PriestPriest
20 Jul 195641.1AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Pittsburgh (Ruthenian), Pennsylvania, USA
20 Jul 195641.1AppointedTitular Bishop of Theveste
23 Oct 195641.4Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Theveste
6 Jul 196348.1AppointedBishop of Passaic (Ruthenian), New Jersey, USA
22 Dec 196752.5AppointedBishop of Pittsburgh (Ruthenian), Pennsylvania, USA
5 Mar 196852.7InstalledBishop of Pittsburgh (Ruthenian), Pennsylvania, USA
21 Feb 196953.7AppointedArchbishop of Munhall (Ruthenian), USA
12 Jun 199176.0RetiredArchbishop of Pittsburgh (Ruthenian), Pennsylvania, USA
7 Mar 199579.7DiedArchbishop Emeritus of Pittsburgh (Ruthenian), Pennsylvania, USA

MicroData Summary for Stephen John Kocisko:
Archbishop Stephen John Kocisko (born , died ) Archbishop Emeritus of Pittsburgh

  • a priest for 53.9 years
  • a bishop for 38.4 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • d: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 144
  • ob/c2+: Revue des Ordinations Épiscopales, Issue 1956, Number 93

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013