Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Bl. Mykola (Nicola) Czarneckyj (Charnetsky), C.SS.R. †

Deceased

Titular Bishop of Lebedus


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
14 Sep 1884BornSemakivzi
2 Oct 190925.1Ordained PriestPriest of Ivano-Frankivsk [Stanisławów] (Ukrainian), Ukraine
16 Sep 192036.0ProfessedPriest of Congregation of the Most Holy Redeemer
16 Jan 193146.3AppointedTitular Bishop of Lebedus
2 Feb 193146.4Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Lebedus
2 Apr 195974.6DiedTitular Bishop of Lebedus
27 Jul 2001Beatified

MicroData Summary for Bl. Mykola (Nicola) Czarneckyj (Charnetsky):
Bishop Bl. Mykola (Nicola) Czarneckyj (Charnetsky) C.SS.R. (born , died ) Titular Bishop of Lebedus

  • a priest for 49.5 years
  • a bishop for 28.2 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • c2: Annuaire Pontifical Catholique, Year 1932
  • op/bd/ob/d/beat: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 163, Additions/Corrections (front)
  • b/c2+: Revue des Ordinations Épiscopales, Issue 1931, Number 6

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2014
code: v2.9.8, 8 Mar 2014; data: 5 Apr 2014